High Leigh primary school

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money solely for the school. We hold summer and christmas fairs, organise raffles throughout the year and normally one sponsored event a year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 May 1985: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF WESTFIELD (Working name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF WESTFIELD SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Stevens | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Zaghlul | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Aristidou | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Church | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.80k | £1.36k | £2.63k | £2.48k | £2.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | £1.54k | £3.57k | £2.62k | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH MARCH 1985 as amended on 07 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO THE ASSOCIATION MAY: (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RALATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF,PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL;AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Leigh Primary school
Schofield Way
HODDESDON
EN11 8GF
- Phone:
- 01992465739
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window