PROTEUS THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proteus Theatre Company has a history of creating high quality work, producing a programme of touring shows, projects, workshops including participatory opportunities for the wider community. Making work for and with diverse communities, from rural villages to socially excluded young people, creating amazing experiences, advancing education and enriching lives through the performing arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £168,940 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 1985: Standard registration
- PROTEUS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Penfold | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Terri Elizabeth Reid | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Sweet | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Edith Caffrey | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.84k | £317.53k | £286.20k | £300.65k | £355.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £283.14k | £199.20k | £397.80k | £349.27k | £341.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £109.79k | £151.35k | £79.79k | £79.79k | £168.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/07/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE ALL MEMBERS OF SOCIETY TO EXPERIENCE HIGH QUALITY PERFORMANCE ART AND TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING THROUGH PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES, PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WHO ARE MOST DISADVANTAGED, THROUGH PROFESSIONAL PERFORMANCE WORK AND PARTICIPATORY PROJECTS ENCOMPASSING ART FORMS AS DIVERSE AS, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE TO, FILM, CIRCUS, MUSIC, LITERATURE, PHOTOGRAPHY AND NEW MEDIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROTEUS CREATION SPACE
COUNCIL ROAD
BASINGSTOKE
HAMPSHIRE
RG21 3DH
- Phone:
- 01256354541
- Email:
- info@proteustheatre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window