THE TWYFORD WATERWORKS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Trust is to preserve Twyford Waterworks as a Scheduled Ancient Monument, and to develop its educational and leisure potential through the formation of a Museum of Water Supply.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 25 May 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Feldwick | Chair | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Martin Jones | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Adam Fish | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN PHILIP ATHERTON | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Matthew Feldwick | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dickson | Trustee | 22 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jayne Cook | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVE SMITH | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ALEXANDER BROADWAY | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STEPHEN DOWN | Trustee | 08 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
PAM MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAY CAINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN BILLINGHURST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.26k | £18.89k | £33.66k | £34.08k | £43.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.52k | £18.69k | £30.25k | £31.47k | £35.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £11.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 JULY 2003 as amended on 20 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN THE FORMER TWYFORD WATERWORKS, HAMPSHIRE FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND DISPLAY OF ALL THINGS AND MATTERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE ABSTRACTION, TREATMENT, DISTRIBUTION AND CONSUMPTION OF WATER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Twyford Waterworks Trust
40 Chamberlayne Road
EASTLEIGH
Hampshire
SO50 5JH
- Phone:
- 02380610814
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window