GARTH UNDER 5'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHILD CARE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 15 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nasreen Ali Mohamed | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marden | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rocio Gonzalez Camacho | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alisa Hill | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mia Dowling | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Corrigan | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Byrne | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.18k | £59.08k | £81.54k | £70.45k | £63.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.81k | £74.16k | £79.46k | £71.11k | £44.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £26.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2022 | 663 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH OCTOBER 1979
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Braybrooke House
Braybrooke Road
BRACKNELL
RG42 2HF
- Phone:
- 07940229291
- Email:
- garthnursery@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window