DULOE JUBILEE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RUN AND MAINTAIN THE VILLAGE HALL.PROVIDE A PLACE WHERE PARISHIONERS AND OTHER PEOPLE, OF WHATEVER BACKGROUND OR RELIGION, CAN MEET ON A REGULAR OR NON- REGULAR BASIS. WE ALSO SUPPORT THE FORMATION OF NEW ORGANISATIONS, SOCIETIES, CLUBS ETC. AND IN PARTICULAR TRY TO ENCOURAGE THESE ENTITIES TO PROVIDE A FRAMEWORK TO INTRODUCE YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN THEIR ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 20 May 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERYL ROSE LESLEY CHUDLEIGH | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
TRACY ANNE DODGE | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEREK HILTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.85k | £19.36k | £7.76k | £8.84k | £11.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.52k | £6.43k | £10.77k | £13.45k | £8.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £220 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £450 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2TH NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE VILLAGE HALL FOR THE PARISHIONERS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF DULOE AND SURROUNDING PARISHES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OS LIFE FOR THE SAID PARISHIONERS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DULOE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 TREMADART CLOSE
DULOE
LISKEARD
PL14 4PX
- Phone:
- 01503624208
- Email:
- laticslad9344@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window