Trustees BRISTOL U3A
Charity number: 291783

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian McDowell Bickerton | Chair | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Machin | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Anne Watts | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Knight | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norma Sherratt | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Graham Baker | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Buckley | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Johnson | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Charles Bromberg | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Wilson | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.