CONSONANT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Legal advice provision, community education, empowerment, media and policy work, nursery, employment and training services, health promotion, volunteering, IT and ESOL classes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income:
£1,180,854
Donations and legacies | £427.30k | |
Charitable activities | £678.30k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £26.66k | |
Other | £48.60k |
Total expenditure:
£1,620,394
Raising funds | £118.87k | |
Charitable activities | £1.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£28,777 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £278,481 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £118.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.50m |
People

31 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
93 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 May 1985: Standard registration
- MIGRANTS RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebekah Louise Duncan | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Reid | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sile Reynolds | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ISABELLA MARIA COELHO PEREIRA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £718.58k | £501.99k | £1.56m | £1.26m | £1.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £767.57k | £755.52k | £1.39m | £1.62m | £1.62m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £213.83k | £350.34k | £0 | N/A | £278.48k | |
|
Income from government grants | £156.56k | £151.65k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £994 | £41.55k | £701.12k | £489.53k | £427.30k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.96k | £26.92k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £711.52k | £433.34k | £392.11k | £678.47k | £678.30k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £70 | £187 | £24.70k | £35.65k | £26.66k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.04k | £0 | £440.22k | £56.05k | £48.60k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £54.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £761.15k | £683.16k | £1.32m | £1.48m | £1.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £13.20k | £67.37k | £143.33k | £118.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.65k | £5.50k | £7.76k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.78k | £59.16k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.49m | £2.28k | £165.05k | £194.93k | £160.16k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £922.44k | £740.26k | £419.03k | |
|
Other assets | £157.38k | £1.38m | £851.26k | £728.18k | £633.14k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £54.57k | £50.55k | £397.83k | £463.62k | £423.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/05/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2010 as amended on 31 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND MINORITY ETHNIC MIGRANT WORKERS OF ANY NATIONALITY AND THEIR FAMILIES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, HEALTH PROTECTION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RSM RESTRUCTURING ADVISORY LLP
25 FARRINGDON STREET
LONDON
EC4A 4AB
- Phone:
- 0203 201 8000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window