THE NNLS OVERSEAS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide help to parish people in any part of the world in general, and to children in the Chernobyl area of the former Soviet union, in particular.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Belarus
Governance
- 05 June 1985: Standard registration
- 21 April 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JEWISH CHERNOBYL CHILDREN (Working name)
- THE NNLS REFUGEE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275 | £4 | £72 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.10k | £3.63k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 05 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 22 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 11 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD APRIL 1985
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PERSONS PROFESSING THE JEWISH FAITH OR THEIR DESCENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT AMONG SUCH PERSONS OF THE JEWISH RELIGION AND OF EDUCATION IN THE PRACTICES AND TRADITIONS OF THAT RELIGION AND THE PROMOTION OF JEWISH HISTORY AND CULTURE. 3. THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION CONCERNING THE HISTORICAL ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL CAUSES OF RACIAL, RELIGIOUS AND POLITICAL PERSECUTION AND THE DENIAL OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND THE PROBLEMS OF RESETTLING AND REHABILITATING THE VICTIMS THEREOF BY MEANS OF RESEARCH INTO SUCH CASES AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window