HATFIELD BROAD OAK UNDER 5S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hatfield Broad Oak Under 5s provides high quality care and education for pre school children: we aim to work in partnership with parents to help children to learn and develop; to add to the life and well-being of our local community; and to offer children and their parents a service that promotes equality and values diversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £21,155 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 12 June 1985: Standard registration
- HBO UNDER 5S (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RONALD ANDREW WAITE | Chair | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.35k | £44.25k | £39.54k | £45.10k | £41.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.12k | £46.87k | £38.43k | £48.94k | £42.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £33.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.04k | N/A | £27.83k | £29.39k | £21.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/02/1982 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY: (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART; (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN; (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HBO Under 5s
Preschool Building
High Street
Hatfield Broad Oak
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertford
- Phone:
- 01279879138
- Email:
- info@hbounder5s.co.uk
- Website:
-
hbounder5s.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window