Financial history BORDEN PARISH HALL

Charity number: 291838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.31k £22.20k £23.12k £19.87k £35.64k
Total expenditure £15.15k £14.70k £11.77k £18.32k £46.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.05k £10.67k N/A £12.24k