BRITISH FRIENDS OF GESHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GESHER'S MAIN ACTIVITY IS DESIGNING & FUNDING PROJECTS THAT BUILD LINKS, REMOVE BARRIERS & ENCOURAGE UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN JEWS OF DIFFERENT BACKGROUNDS & STRENGTHEN THEIR SHARED IDENTITY. PROGRAMMES REACH A WIDE RANGE OF AGE GROUPS VIA EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS, MEDIA INITIATIVES, LEADERSHIP COURSES & MEDIATION TO ENABLE A STRONGER, MORE PROSPEROUS & UNITED JEWISH PEOPLE IN ISRAEL & AROUND THE WORLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 14 June 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Gary Carno | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Boris Ben-Ari | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY HUGH MELAMET | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.92k | £84.41k | £59.88k | £26.99k | £52.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.50k | £88.59k | £53.86k | £35.47k | £50.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
THE FUTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF THE JEWISH PUBLIC IN ISRAEL IN PARTICULAR AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN GENERAL BY PROMOTING THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE JEWISH HERITAGE AND TRADITIONAL RELIGIOUS AND MORAL VALUES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEY ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
ISRAEL IN PARTICULAR AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN GENERAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o HMSA Limited
Unit 13, Second Floor,
Olympia House
Armitage Road
LONDON
NW11 8RQ
- Phone:
- 02077249434
- Email:
- info@gesheruk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window