Accounts and annual returns THE ANDEAN PROJECT

Charity Number: 291879
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 February 2009 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 22 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required