Financial history ST JOHN THE THEOLOGIAN GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 291884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £47.24k £42.46k £55.16k £50.65k £51.58k
Total expenditure £69.89k £81.58k £74.01k £76.33k £69.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.90k £2.05k N/A N/A N/A