VOLUNTARY ACTION ISLINGTON LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Supporting member community organisations including provision of information and support * Capacity building work with voluntary and community organisations in the borough including training * Developing the local voluntary sector including promoting and supporting volunteering * Supporting networks including the Islington Community Network
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £115,250 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Islington
Governance
- 05 June 1985: Standard registration
- I V A C (Working name)
- VOLUNTARY ACTION ISLINGTON (Working name)
- ISLINGTON VOLUNTARY ACTION COUNCIL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Victoria Hutchins | Chair | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ali Jabeen | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Burgess | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Turner | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Gascogine | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Santa Gascoigne | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Hettiarachi | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jorge Llorens Ferrero | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £416.95k | £315.57k | £407.95k | £490.85k | £495.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £439.14k | £366.83k | £371.67k | £437.55k | £493.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £75.00k | £101.61k | £164.28k | £141.00k | £115.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14/1/1993, 15/1/2008, 23/11/2009, 10/11/2010, AND ON CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAMED DATED 10/12/2009 & SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE COOPERATION IN ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Voluntary Action Islington
200A Pentonville Road
LONDON
N1 9JP
- Phone:
- 02078325800
- Email:
- information@vai.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window