KNIGHTS HILL DAY NURSERY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
Governance
- 18 June 1985: Standard registration
- 20 November 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.80k | £184.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.47k | £173.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 04 April 2008 | 429 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 06 March 2006 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 06 March 2006 | 34 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 10 March 2005 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 15 August 2005 | 196 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 1984
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CARE AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN BELOW SCHOOL AGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW SCHOOL AGE WITHIN THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS CAN PARTICIPATE WHERE APPROPRIATE; C. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; D. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGS WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AS IS CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEED "HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS".
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window