WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HERITAGE CENTRE/MUSEUM AND VISITOR INFORMATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 08 July 1985: Standard registration
- WOTTON HERITAGE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reginald Clarke | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Roper | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugo Grimes | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH JOAN FALCON-UFF | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|||||
James Shepherd Barrett | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|||||
JEFF WALSHE Secretary | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Haidee Jackson | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janet Walshe | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.51k | £20.54k | £19.68k | £15.75k | £14.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.21k | £14.86k | £19.45k | £17.63k | £18.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.40k | £3.50k | £3.50k | £6.17k | £3.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/03/1985 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/1990 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2011
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY OF WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE AND ADJOINING PARISHES. B. TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION OF RECORDS AND ARTEFACTS OF ALL KINDS PERTAINING TO WOOTON-UNDER-EDGE AND ADJOINING PARISHES.
Area of benefit
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Water Lane
Wotton-under-Edge
GL12 7LG
- Phone:
- 01453843060
- Email:
- wuehistsoc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window