THE AFNAN LIBRARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining, developing and expanding the collection of books, manuscripts and archive material of the late Hasan M Balyuzi as the core collection of a research library (The Afnan Library) in accordance with Mr Balyuzi's testamentory wishes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 June 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Manijeh Afnan-Murray | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carmel Cunningham Momen | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iqan Shahidighamsari | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Payam Foroudi | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patrick O'Mara | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BALYUZI | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOOJAN MOMEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/06/2020 | 20/06/2021 | 20/06/2022 | 20/06/2023 | 20/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.06k | £17.40k | £7.43k | £226.11k | £25.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.66k | £18.69k | £17.98k | £19.82k | £26.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 June 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 June 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 June 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 June 2020 | 24 May 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 June 2020 | 24 May 2021 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/05/1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19/05/2015
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE BAHA'I FAITH IN PRESERVING AND DEVELOPING THE COLLECTION WHICH INCULDES BOOKS TABLETS DOCUMENTS MATERIAL FROM DIARIES AND LETTER BOOKS MANUSCRIPTS PHOTOGRAPHS AND NEWSPAPER CUTTINGS AND WHICH RELATE TO THE BAHA'I FAITH BRITISH EUROPEAN AND WORLD HISTORY MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES IN GENERAL AND TO COMPARATIVE RELIGION FORMED BY THE DECEASED IN HIS LIFE TIME AND GENERALLY TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY OF THE BAHA'I FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Chapel
14 Pleasant Place
SANDY
Bedfordshire
SG19 1HX
- Phone:
- 07763363594
- Email:
- admin@afnanlibrary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window