THE NEWICK DISTRESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drastically reduced income due to bereavement, ill-health, unemployment or broken marriages is the most frequent cause for help but there are regular cases too; for example, help with heating bills in very cold weather or with school uniforms on a change of school. In 2021 grants were made to 13 individuals or families in a total of 39 separate payments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Sussex
Governance
- 14 June 1985: Standard registration
- Newick Trust (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN GERALD BENSON REEKIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA LOUISE BAILEY | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Paul Kevin Mundy | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LEILA FRANCIS | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY LIONEL CLINTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.71k | £20.88k | £13.41k | £11.93k | £18.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.02k | £19.24k | £9.66k | £12.51k | £14.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £145 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND MAY 1985
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE VILLAGE OF NEWICK, EAST SUSSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. IN SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WAYS AS TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NEWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HIGH HURST CLOSE
NEWICK
LEWES
BN8 4NJ
- Phone:
- 01825722512
- Email:
- ianreekie24@gmail.com
- Website:
-
3,HighHurstClose,Newick,EastSussex.BN84NJ
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window