Financial history EXCEL FUND

Charity number: 291967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £46.76k £42.73k £39.43k £29.92k £37.17k
Total expenditure £48.69k £46.01k £52.29k £41.94k £44.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A