Governing document ILMINSTER ENTERTAINMENTS SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 291977

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH FEBRUARY 1985 AMENDED BY A RESOLUTIONS PASSED 30TH MAY 1985, 2 NOVEMBER 1998, 17 NOVEMBER 2003 AND 20 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL FORMS OF DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ART, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRESENTATION OF LIVE AMATEUR PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.