ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND CULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing religious and educational facilities. Organising Seminars, also social and religious functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 12 June 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hafiz Ishtiaq Chaudhry | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ZIA UR REHMAN | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHEIKH MAHMOOD | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
TAHIR YUSAF AWAN | Trustee | 13 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
OBAIDUR REHMAN SIDDIQUI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06m | £513.82k | £509.06k | £577.02k | £442.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £395.47k | £287.50k | £372.97k | £491.22k | £418.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £44.96k | £2.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £352.59k | £402.66k | £412.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £35.47k | £60.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £889.93k | £97.60k | £44.96k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £168.01k | £63.63k | £25.98k | £104.77k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £364.37k | £280.10k | £361.36k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £31.10k | £7.41k | £11.61k | £3.42k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £487.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/10/1984
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE SOCIETY ARE: A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM; AND B) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE SOCIETY SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: (I) TO ARRANGE CLASSES FOR CHILDREN, YOUTH AND ADULTS FOR THE STUDY AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE HOLY QURAN AND THE SUNNAH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BELIEF IN CLAUSE 3 AND FOR THE TEACHING OF ARABIC AND OTHER RELATED LANGUAGES. (II) TO POPULARISE ISLAMIC THOUGHT THROUGH LECTURES AND MEETINGS AS WELL AS EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL AND SOCIAL FUNCTIONS ONSISTENT WITH TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE HOLY QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE LAST AND FINAL PROPHET - PROPHET MOHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM). - 1 - (III) TO PROVIDE AND DEVELOP A CENTRE WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON FOR COMMUNITY COHESION AND EXCHANGE OF IDEAS, INFORMATION AND EXPERIENCE OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY. (IV) TO DEVELOP GOOD RELATIONS AND HARMONY WITH NON MUSLIMS AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS. (V) TO ARRANGE VISITS TO THE INFIRM AND TO INMATES IN PRISONS AND DETENTION CENTRES. (VI) TO ESTABLISH A MUSLIM CENTRE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON WHICH WILL SERVE AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP, LEARNING, RECREATION, SOCIAL GATHERING, YOUTH ACTIVITIES, WOMEN'S GROUP, HELP FOR THE ELDERLY, THE INFIRM, WELFARE AND PREACHING OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AS DEFINED ABOVE IN CLAUSE 3. (VII) TO ASSIST IN ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE BURIAL OF DECEASED MUSLIMS AND TO HELP THE ELDERLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PUMP LANE
HAYES
UB3 3NB
- Phone:
- 0208 561 7149
- Website:
-
hayesmuslimcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window