Financial history THE SAGA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 291991
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019
Total gross income £204.78k £449.84k £186.82k £210.21k £191.28k
Total expenditure £231.68k £435.35k £290.40k £316.12k £226.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A