THE SAGA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 291991
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Saga Charitable Trust acts as an umbrella for Saga's charitable activities. This includes funding sustainable projects in developing countries visited by Saga holiday makers and supporting Saga's national charity partner, currently The Silver Line; a free confidential helpline providing friendship and advice to older people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2019

Total income: £191,279
Total expenditure: £226,608

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolivia
  • Cambodia
  • Ethiopia
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Laos
  • Madagascar
  • Morocco
  • Namibia
  • Nepal
  • Peru
  • South Africa
  • Tanzania
  • Uganda
  • Vietnam
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 June 1985: Standard registration
  • 25 February 2020: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE SAGE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019
Total gross income £204.78k £449.84k £186.82k £210.21k £191.28k
Total expenditure £231.68k £435.35k £290.40k £316.12k £226.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2019 17 July 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 17 July 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2018 03 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 03 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2017 07 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 19 June 2017 On Time