SHIPTON GORGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We strive to keep the village hall in good repair and update appliances and redecorate and maintain accordingly. We hold fund-raising events at regular intervals in order to raise money to fund improvements to the hall. The hall is used by all sections of the village community on a regular basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 16 July 1985: Standard registration
- SHIPTON GORGE VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hewlett | Chair | 11 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Paul Andrew Thimont | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Yvette Gloria Jean Smith | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Bartrum-Lang | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Patricia James | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Chomacki | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham Garner | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sally Parker | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.22k | £14.48k | £17.95k | £9.24k | £8.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.55k | £8.29k | £4.83k | £6.55k | £5.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED OF 20TH MARCH 1985 SURRENDERED ON 14TH MAY AND REPLACED BY LEASE AND TRUST DEED OF 14TH MAY 1991
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SHIPTON GORGE IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHIPTON GORGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shipton Gorge Village Hall
Church Lane
Shipton Gorge
Bridport
Dorset
DT6 4LX
- Phone:
- 01308897278
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window