THE SOUTH WEST GENERAL PRACTICE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKING GRANTS TO PRIMARY CARE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL AND UNIVERSITY OF EXETER MEDICAL SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 June 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Roger Jones | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Neal | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Elizabeth Eley | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Blythe | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Katrina Turner | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Macleod | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JOHN LENNOX CAMPBELL MD FRCGP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor PHILIP HUGH EVANS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.86k | £13.49k | £2.94k | £9.12k | £63.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.80k | £17.17k | £15.02k | £19.86k | £15.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 MAY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 11 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
A. TO FURTHER EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND TEACHING FOR ENTRY TO THE MEDICAL PROFESSION, ALLIED PROFESSIONS AND OTHERS WORKING IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE GENERAL PRACTITIONERS IN THE PROVISION OF PRIMARY HEALTH CARE IN THE SOUTH WEST REGION. B. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF GENERAL PRACTICE IN THE UNIVERSITIES OF BRISTOL AND EXETER. C. TO SUPPORT SUCH ACADEMIC AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN EACH OF THE DEPARTMENTS IN THE SAID UNIVERSITIES AS ARE APPROVED BY THE HEAD OF DEPARTMENT/OR OTHER PROPER PERSON OFFICER CONCERNED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF DEED).
Area of benefit
SOUTH WESTERN REGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROFESSOR PHILIP EVANS
University of Exeter
Heavitree Road
EXETER
EX1 2LU
- Phone:
- 01392722743
- Email:
- swgptrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window