Financial history ALABARE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY

Charity number: 292024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £54.02k £53.68k £312.20k £9.69k £53.68k
Total expenditure £39.99k £49.16k £32.04k £7.65k £49.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.21k N/A N/A N/A