WOOLSTONES COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The care maintenance and management of the community centre for the benefit of the residents of Woolstone, Milton Keynes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 15 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HOWARD | Chair | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Emma Clare Martin | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Marion Janet Fenton-O'Creevy | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Charmaine Bernadette Howard | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev IAN CHARLES HERBERT | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Jane Preedy | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ALISTAIR MARTIN | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Kiera Tunley | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.72k | £3.11k | £13.03k | £18.36k | £14.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.70k | £12.24k | £11.12k | £21.85k | £29.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD APRIL 1985 AND AMENDED 6TH MAY 1986
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WOOLSTONES AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church Woolstone
9 Mill Lane
Woolstone
MILTON KEYNES
MK15 0AJ
- Phone:
- 07808391430
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window