UFFINGTON MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage the understanding of the history and heritage of Uffington village and its' surroundings by collecting, recording and conserving material both from the past and the present day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
- Swindon
Governance
- 02 August 1985: Standard registration
- Uffington Museum (Working name)
- TOM BROWN'S SCHOOL MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Elizabeth Pilcher | Chair | 09 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Golding | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Fiona Ward | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Charles | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Foxhall | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Puddicombe | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fenella Ann Oberman | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.76k | £15.48k | £10.16k | £6.58k | £5.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.79k | £8.39k | £8.01k | £4.78k | £11.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 16TH JANUARY 1989 as amended on 06 Aug 2018 as amended on 06 Aug 2018 as amended on 06 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM COMPRISING TOM BROWNS SCHOOL TOGETHER WITH SUCH EXHIBITS AS MAY BE PROVIDED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Lower Common Cottage
Lower Common
Uffington
FARINGDON
Oxfordshire
SN7 7SQ
- Phone:
- 07391516149
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window