FRIENDS OF SIR JOHN LAWES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a parent and teacher association supporting the school and education of children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 October 1985: Standard registration
- SIR JOHN LAWES SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Edward Bresler | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Darrell Montgomery | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Patel | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Newbery | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Wimbleton | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carla Ryan Griffiths | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.07k | £4.43k | £10.29k | £15.72k | £51.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.52k | £19.37k | £27.05k | £7.76k | £67.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH OCTOBER 1990 AS AMENDED ON 03 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 03 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The 10th Harpenden Scout Hut
Crabtree Fields
Waldegrave Park
HARPENDEN
Hertfordshire
AL5 5SF
- Phone:
- 01582760043
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window