WYCOMBE TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talking newspaper for the visually impaired
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 19 July 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Bull | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gerald Alan Halls | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Mary Paterson Wray | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Elspeth Andrew | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Jane Booth | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Raymond Graham Isted | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Longman | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Gyselynck | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Mortimer-Biggs | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MR D SPARKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.04k | £2.38k | £3.81k | £5.87k | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £3.68k | £3.59k | £2.81k | £4.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED NOVEMBER 1984 as amended on 09 Oct 2018 as amended on 05 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST THE BLIND, THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND THOSE HAVING DIFFICULTY IN READING DUR TO TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
HIGH WYCOMBE PRINCES RISBOROUGH MARLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Millbank
Mill Road
MARLOW
Buckinghamshire
SL7 1UA
- Phone:
- 01494 854920
- Website:
-
wycombetalkingnewspaper.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window