BRITISH VENDEEN SHEEP SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and adminstration of Pedigree Vendeen Sheep breeding in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 July 1985: Standard registration
- BRITISH VENDEEN SHEEP SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM BUTCHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT NEIL HOWIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS EDWARD JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.03k | £2.08k | £656 | £829 | £552 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.31k | £4.00k | £1.96k | £306 | £769 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 423 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 423 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 789 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 789 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 April 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 11 April 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 28TH JULY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE AND SCIENCE BY INVESTIGATEING EFFICIENT BREEDING IN GREAT BRITAIN OF VENDEEN SHEPP WHITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING AND EXPANDING THE STOCKS OF SUCH SHEEP AND DEVELOPING AND ADVANCING THE MOST EFFICIENT AND UP TO DATE METHODS OF REARING SAME.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORCHARD COTTAGE
MOAT LANE
COWDEN
EDENBRIDGE
TN8 7DP
- Phone:
- 01342851200
- Email:
- info@vendeen.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window