GRAND ORDER OF WATER RATS CHARITIES FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The GOWR Charities Fund was founded to help members of the theatrical profession, or their dependents, who due to old age or ill health are in need. Other charitable organisations and individuals can also be helped if there are sufficient funds available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 September 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Brown | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gauntlett | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Brock | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rick Wakeman | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Emmett | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAPLAN KAYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.95k | £369.44k | £128.46k | £167.47k | £136.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.36k | £123.92k | £191.58k | £157.54k | £178.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH MAY 1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POOR OR NECESSITOUS MEMBERS OF THE GRAND ORDER OF WATER RATS AND WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH MEMBERS OR NECESSITOUS PERSONS ENGAGED OR CONCERNED OR FORMALLY ENGAGED OR CONCERNED AS THEATRICAL ENTERTAINERS MUSIC HALL AND VARIETY ARTISTES OR IN OTHE ASSOCIATIED ENGAGEMENTS AND THE WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS THEREOF. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
328 GRAYS INN ROAD
LONDON
WC1X 8BZ
- Phone:
- 02072783248
- Email:
- charities@gowr.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window