Governing document THE HORNERS CHARITY FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/03/1929 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/04/1934 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 02/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/07/2012 as amended on 15 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITIES FOR WHICH A MANSION HOUSE FUND SHALL BE OPENED BY THE LORD MAYOR OF THE CITY OF LONDON AS DECIDED BY THE MASTER AND WARDENS OF THE HORNERS COMPANY. SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE COURT OF THE COMPANY MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.