Trustees THE HORNERS CHARITY FUND
Charity Number: 292204
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David John Giachardi | Chair | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael O'Brien | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MARTIN DAVIS | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Katherine Joyce | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MARTIN ANDREW PRICE | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barry Martin Maunders | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David William Kirkham Chitty | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Edmund MacCabe | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ian Birrell | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Ralph Freedman | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.