THE HEALTHCARE PLAY SPECIALIST EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal activity is to advance education with particular reference to the study of developmental and therapeutic play, including psycho-social care, in hospital of children and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 September 1985: Standard registration
- 18 October 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1205808 THE SOCIETY OF HEALTH PLAY SPECIALISTS
- HOSPITAL PLAY STAFF EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.97k | £30.93k | £29.64k | £30.44k | £32.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.47k | £18.96k | £24.15k | £36.83k | £123.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25/06/1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19/05/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26/07/2006 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/2014
Charitable objects
(A) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE STUDY OF DEVELOPMENTAL AND THERAPEUTIC PLAY - INCLUDING PSYCHO-SOCIAL CARE IN HOSPITAL OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES; (B) PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF CARE THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF HOSPITAL PLAY STAFF; (C) THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO THE CARE IN HOSPITAL AND IN THE COMMUNITY OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window