Financial history POLISH SCOUTING ASSOCIATION (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED

Charity number: 292231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £331.53k £421.76k £372.13k £340.42k £616.63k
Total expenditure £182.79k £135.11k £221.78k £183.27k £449.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £350.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £28.72k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £237.02k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £241.49k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £446.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.34k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £248.50k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0