Trustees POLISH SCOUTING ASSOCIATION (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED
Charity number: 292231

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAREK SZABLEWSKI | Chair | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zbigniew Pisanski | Trustee | 09 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ala Tabor | Trustee | 09 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Krystyna Buyukardicli | Trustee | 09 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Pogorzelski | Trustee | 09 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marcin Czabanski | Trustee | 09 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kamil Jan Zylczynski | Trustee | 09 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Sempolinska-Uzarowicz | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marta Weglinska | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Nowak | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kristina Reitmeier | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beata Pawlikowska | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Janczuk | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danuta Figiel | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aleksandra Maria Mankowska | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Francis Peplinski | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sandig | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Barbara Ciecierska | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JAN ROSPEDZIHOWSKI | Trustee | 22 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
STANISLAW BERKIETA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.