HYDERABAD CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing relief of poverty distress and sickness and the advancement of education the promotion of religion and the provision of facilities for recreation and leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the quality of life of the families whom originate from Hyderabad in India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 19 August 1985: Standard registration
- 13 February 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8 | £8 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £324 | £324 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 05 December 2019 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 04 December 2019 | 667 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 04 December 2019 | 1032 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH JUNE 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHOSE FAMILIES ORIGINATE FROM HYDERABAD IN INDIA, INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF RELIGION, AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIS FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window