Financial history THE ESSEX ASSOCIATION OF CHANGE RINGERS

Charity Number: 292250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £325.82k £84.68k £22.89k £30.55k £44.87k
Total expenditure £12.63k £27.13k £41.14k £35.81k £28.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A