SELE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE HERTFORD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 July 1985: Standard registration
- 27 August 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £968 | £785 | £583 | £998 | |
|
Total expenditure | £962 | £681 | £701 | £982 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 02 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 13 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 15 October 2008 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE TO WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION, AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
HERTFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window