DONKEY BREED SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and improve the standard of donkeys in general by breeding and to encourage the use, appreciation, wellbeing and protection of the donkey. To promote public education in the various arts and sciences in connection with the donkey and the use, appreciation, care and management thereof.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY CLARKE | Chair | 02 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Newson | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Moon | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Boyce | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Tetlow | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Goodchild | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Turner | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Roberts | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Stronge | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Barrett | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Trudy Affleck | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Sims | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kendall Young | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE TRAVELL | Trustee | 12 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JONATHAN GLOVER | Trustee | 30 October 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.07k | £44.50k | £49.64k | £50.39k | £63.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.34k | £49.95k | £55.31k | £57.10k | £63.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH APRIL 1985 AMENDED ON 28 OCTOBER 2006 as amended on 12 Sep 2021 as amended on 12 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF DONKEYS IN GENERAL BY BREEDING AND TO ENCOURAGE THE USE, APPRECIATION, WELL BEING AND PROTECTION OF THE DONKEY. (B) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE VARIOUS ARTS AND SCIENCES IN CONNECTION WITH THE DONKEY AND THE USE, APPRECIATION, CARE AND MANAGEMENT THEREOF. (C) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO THE DONKEY AND TO HELP AND CO-OPERATE WITH PEOPLE AND SOCIETIES WHO PROVIDE FOR THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF THE DONKEY IN NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, NEGLECT, LACK OF KNOWLEDGE, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES. (D) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO MATTERS RELATING TO THE DONKEY AND THE PUBLICATIONS OF THE RESULTS THEREOF
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HERMITAGE
POOTINGS ROAD
CROCKHAM HILL
EDENBRIDGE
TN8 6SD
- Phone:
- 01732864414
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window