Trustees DONKEY BREED SOCIETY
Charity number: 292268

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY CLARKE | Chair | 02 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Newson | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Moon | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Boyce | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Tetlow | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Goodchild | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Turner | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Roberts | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Stronge | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Barrett | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Trudy Affleck | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Sims | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kendall Young | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE TRAVELL | Trustee | 12 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JONATHAN GLOVER | Trustee | 30 October 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.