Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF BILLERICAY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 292276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 07 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required