VAJRAVARAHI KADAMPA MEDITATION CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROMOTES BUDDHIST FAITH OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION THROUGH FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: 1. PROVISION OF STUDY AND MEDITATION PROGRAMMES FOR BOTH BEGINNERS AND ADVANCED PRACTITIONERS. 2. PROMOTING THE PRACTICE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE. 3. PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR PRACTITIONERS. 4. GENERAL FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
- Wigan
Governance
- 26 July 1985: Standard registration
- V B C LTD (Working name)
- VAJRA VARAHI BUDDHIST CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- VAJRAVARAHI MAHAYANA BUDDHIST CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Leung | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Sarah Grant | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Tracey Oliver-Walsh | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.15k | £81.04k | £76.65k | £87.07k | £104.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.24k | £69.68k | £66.64k | £85.39k | £80.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUN 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 APR 1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 JUN 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 JAN 2017 as amended on 13 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH UNDER THE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF THE ELECTED GENERAL SPIRITUAL DIRECTOR OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE ALL WITHIN THE MAHAYANA BUDDHIST TRADITION OF ATISHA AND JE TSONGKHAPA AS TAUGHT BY VENERABLE GESHE KELSANG GYATSO, THE FOUNDER OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION, THROUGH THE CONTINUOS IMPLEMENTATION OF THE THREE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION STUDY PROGRAMMES: THE GENERAL PROGRAMME, THE FOUNDATION PROGRAMME AND THE TEACHER TRAINING PROGRAMME, ALL AS DEFINED IN SCHEDULE A OF THIS MEMORANDUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vajravarahi Buddhist Centre
38 West Cliff
PRESTON
PR1 8HU
- Phone:
- 01772884919
- Email:
- mail@meditateinlancs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window