Financial history NEXTGRANT LIMITED

Charity number: 292305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £494.86k £377.98k £824.74k £680.94k £584.70k
Total expenditure £184.24k £215.78k £330.08k £653.10k £556.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £808.52k £663.19k £568.08k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £1.62k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k
Income - Other N/A N/A £1.22k £2.75k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £317.27k £561.56k £505.66k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £12.81k £91.54k £50.54k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.57k £6.99k £5.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £251.57k £487.90k £443.45k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £12.81k £0 £42.29k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0