DIABETES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 292317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support and advance research in the field of diabetes and particularly juvenile (insulin dependent) diabetes in the United Kingdom and throughout the world and to provide material of an educational and informational nature to persons who are interested in and affected by diabetes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 June 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Richard Thompson Askew Trustee 24 September 2015
ACTION FOR A-T
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wells Lawrence House
126 Back Church Lane
London
E1 1FH
Phone:
03451232399