SOOD ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 292322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The SAUK meets at members place.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Indu Sood Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record
Renu Sood Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record
Vir Mohindra Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record
Mr Balkrishan Mayer Trustee 11 August 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £5 £0 £5
Total expenditure £1.83k £0 £5 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2024 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2024 730 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2024 1095 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1651 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1651 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
46 SUMNER ROAD
HARROW
HA1 4BU
Phone:
02082481473
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available