HOUSE MILL TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration of the Worlds's largest remaining tidal mill. Provision of an Education resource. Hydro-generation scheme to provide a source of revenue
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newham
Governance
- 23 August 1985: Standard registration
- THE HOUSE MILL (Working name)
- RIVER LEA TIDAL MILL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE PASSMORE EDWARDS MUSEUM TRUST (HOUSE MILL) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HAGGERTY | Chair | 05 July 1995 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WALTERS | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Harbold | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Spalding | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Feeroza Patel | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CREGAN | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY A CHARTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.46k | £23.59k | £36.03k | £43.69k | £41.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.20k | £58.19k | £52.18k | £39.87k | £39.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JUL 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 APR 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JAN 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
BY ASSOCIATION WITH THE PASSMORE EDWARDS MUSEUM AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE MUSEUMS") TO PRESERVE EXHIBIT AND DISPLAY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY ARTIFACTS, ARCHAEOLOGICAL REMAINS, DOCUMENTS, PHOTOGRAPHS, TRANSPARENCIES, TAPE RECORDINGS, FILM, OBJECT D'ART, IMPLEMENTS, TOOLS OR OTHER OBJECTS OR ARTICLES OF ANY KIND OR OF WHATSOEVER NATURE OF AND CONCERNING THE HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY, GEOLOGY, SOCIOLOGY AND GEOGRAPHY OF THE COUNTY OF ESSEX AND EAST LONDON (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT.)
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MILLERS HOUSE
THREE MILL LANE
BROMLEY-BY-BOW
LONDON
E3 3DU
- Phone:
- 02089804626
- Email:
- info@housemill.org.uk
- Website:
-
housemill.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window