THE ROWAN FOUNDATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making charity specifically supporting Rowan Humberstone in working with adults with learning disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 06 September 1985: Standard registration
- 05 December 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 05 December 2016: Funds transferred to 1099555 ROWAN HUMBERSTONE LIMITED
- ROWAN (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/01/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.15k | £63.75k | £66.12k | £64.90k | £85.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.65k | £34.64k | £47.75k | £97.41k | £2.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 25 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | 25 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 03 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 03 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 19 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 19 June 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 29 JANUARY 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE TRAINING AND FUTURE LIVING,EMPLOYMENT,OCCUPATION,SUSTENANCE,MAINTENANCE AND CARE OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE DIFFICULTY,OR ARE UNABLE TO ATTAIN,A NORMAL STANDARD OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window