The Wallops Women's Institute

Charity Number: 292381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Monthly meetings with speakers and outings

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,322
Total expenditure: £2,072

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 August 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NETHER WALLOP WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
  • THE WALLOPS WI (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Blakeman Chair 31 March 2024
None on record
Sonia Unicombe Trustee 31 March 2024
None on record
Carol Dunlop Trustee 31 March 2024
None on record
PAMELA JANE QUICK Trustee 01 March 2021
OVER WALLOP PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Gillian Mary Donkin Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Thea Shaw Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Sarah Day Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.86k £17 £700 £3.26k £2.32k
Total expenditure £3.71k £213 £1.56k £1.48k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lower Close
Over Wallop
STOCKBRIDGE
SO20 8HZ
Phone:
01264781847
Website:

No information available